Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 02/08/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 02/16/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 02/16/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 04/16/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/16/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/16/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 04/19/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 04/19/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/23/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/01/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/02/2007
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 05/03/2007
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 05/10/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/22/2007