Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/12/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/12/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 02/14/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 02/14/2007
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 02/14/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 02/14/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 02/14/2007
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 02/15/2007
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 02/15/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 02/15/2007
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 02/16/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/28/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/28/2007
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 02/28/2007
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 02/28/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 02/28/2007
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 02/28/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/28/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 02/28/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/28/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/28/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 02/28/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 02/28/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 02/28/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/28/2007
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 02/28/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 02/28/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/28/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/28/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 02/28/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 02/28/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/01/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/01/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/01/2007
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/01/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/01/2007
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 03/01/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 03/01/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 03/01/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 03/06/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 03/06/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/06/2007
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 03/06/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 03/06/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 03/06/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/06/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/06/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 03/06/2007
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 03/06/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/08/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/08/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 03/08/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 03/08/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/12/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/12/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/12/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/12/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/14/2007
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 03/15/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 03/19/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/19/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/19/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/19/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/19/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 03/19/2007
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 03/19/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 03/19/2007
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 03/19/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/21/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/21/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 03/21/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 03/21/2007
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 03/21/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 03/21/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/21/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/23/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 03/23/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 03/23/2007
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 03/26/2007
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 03/26/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/26/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/26/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/27/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 03/27/2007
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 03/27/2007
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 03/27/2007
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 03/28/2007
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 03/28/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 03/28/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/29/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 03/29/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 03/29/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 03/29/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 03/29/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/29/2007
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 04/16/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 04/16/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/16/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 04/16/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 04/16/2007
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/16/2007
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 04/16/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/16/2007
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 04/17/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 04/17/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/17/2007
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 04/18/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 04/19/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/19/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/23/2007
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 04/23/2007
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 04/23/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/23/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 04/23/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/23/2007
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 04/25/2007
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 04/25/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/01/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/01/2007
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 05/01/2007
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 05/01/2007
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 05/02/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 05/03/2007
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 05/15/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/15/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/15/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/15/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 05/15/2007
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 05/15/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/15/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/15/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/16/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/16/2007
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/17/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/21/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 05/21/2007
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 05/21/2007
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 05/21/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/21/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/22/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/22/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/22/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 05/23/2007
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 05/23/2007
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 05/24/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 06/05/2007
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 06/05/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 06/05/2007
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 06/05/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/05/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/05/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/05/2007
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 06/07/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 06/11/2007
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 06/12/2007
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 06/19/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/19/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/20/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/28/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/10/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 07/10/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 07/31/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/04/2007
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 09/14/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/14/2007
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 09/19/2007
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 10/03/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/12/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 10/12/2007
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 10/29/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/29/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 10/31/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 10/31/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/06/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 12/11/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 12/12/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 12/19/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 01/15/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 02/13/2008
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/22/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/01/2008
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 05/13/2008
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/21/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 05/22/2008
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 06/03/2008
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/09/2008
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 06/10/2008
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/18/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/29/2008
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/08/2008
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/08/2008