Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/08/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 02/13/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 02/15/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/06/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/09/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/13/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/18/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/02/2007