Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 02/09/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/12/2007
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 02/12/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/12/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/12/2007
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 02/12/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/12/2007
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 02/12/2007
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 02/12/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 02/12/2007
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 02/12/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 02/12/2007
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 02/12/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 02/12/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 02/12/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/12/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 02/12/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 02/12/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/12/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 02/12/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/12/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 02/12/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 02/12/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 02/12/2007
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 02/12/2007
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 02/12/2007
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 02/12/2007
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 02/12/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 02/12/2007
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 02/12/2007
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 02/12/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 02/12/2007
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 02/12/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 02/12/2007
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 02/12/2007
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 02/12/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/12/2007
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 02/12/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 02/12/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 02/12/2007
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 02/12/2007
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 02/12/2007
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 02/12/2007
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16] 02/12/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 02/12/2007
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 02/12/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 02/12/2007
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 02/12/2007
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 02/12/2007
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 02/12/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/12/2007
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 02/12/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 02/13/2007
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 02/13/2007
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 02/13/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 02/13/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 02/13/2007
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 02/13/2007
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 02/13/2007
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 02/13/2007
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 02/13/2007
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 02/13/2007
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 02/13/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 02/13/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 02/13/2007
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 02/14/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 02/14/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 02/14/2007
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 02/14/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 02/14/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 02/14/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 02/15/2007