Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 02/12/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/12/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/12/2007
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 02/12/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/12/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 02/12/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 02/12/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 02/12/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 02/12/2007
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large]* 02/12/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 02/12/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 02/12/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 02/12/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 02/27/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/29/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/08/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/14/2008
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 07/14/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/14/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/14/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/16/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/16/2008
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/16/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 07/23/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/23/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/23/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/23/2008
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 07/23/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 07/23/2008
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 07/30/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/30/2008
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 07/30/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/30/2008
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 07/30/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/30/2008
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/30/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/30/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/30/2008