Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 02/12/2007
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1]* 02/12/2007
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 02/12/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 02/12/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 02/12/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 02/12/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 02/12/2007
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 02/12/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 02/12/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 02/12/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 02/12/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 02/12/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 02/12/2007
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 02/12/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 02/12/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 02/12/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 02/12/2007
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 02/12/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 02/12/2007
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 02/12/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 02/12/2007
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 02/12/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 02/12/2007
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 02/12/2007
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 02/13/2007
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 02/13/2007
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 02/13/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 02/14/2007
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 02/14/2007
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 02/14/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 02/15/2007
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 02/15/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 02/15/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 02/16/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 02/16/2007
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 02/16/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/01/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/01/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/01/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/01/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/01/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 03/01/2007
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 03/01/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 03/01/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 03/01/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 03/01/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/01/2007
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/01/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/01/2007
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 03/01/2007
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 03/01/2007
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 03/01/2007
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 03/01/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 03/08/2007
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 03/08/2007
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 03/08/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/08/2007
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 03/08/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 03/08/2007
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 03/08/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/13/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 03/13/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/13/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/13/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 03/13/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 03/13/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 03/13/2007
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/13/2007
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 03/13/2007
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 03/13/2007
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 03/13/2007
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 03/20/2007
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 03/20/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/20/2007
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 03/20/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/20/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 03/20/2007
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 03/26/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 03/26/2007
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/26/2007
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 03/26/2007
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 03/26/2007
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 03/26/2007
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 03/26/2007
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/26/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/28/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/28/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/28/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/28/2007
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 04/17/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 04/17/2007
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 04/17/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 04/17/2007
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 04/17/2007
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 04/17/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 04/17/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/17/2007
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 04/25/2007
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 04/25/2007
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 04/25/2007
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 05/10/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 05/22/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/06/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 06/07/2007
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/11/2007
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 06/11/2007
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 06/11/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 06/26/2007
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 07/18/2007
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 07/18/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 07/25/2007
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 08/03/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/05/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/06/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/06/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/10/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 09/18/2007
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 09/18/2007
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 09/18/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 09/18/2007
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 09/18/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 09/27/2007
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 10/04/2007
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 10/10/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 10/10/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 10/22/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 10/22/2007
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 10/30/2007
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 10/30/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 11/01/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 11/07/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 11/07/2007
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 12/04/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 12/06/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 12/06/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 12/06/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 12/11/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 12/19/2007
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 12/19/2007
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 12/19/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 12/19/2007
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 12/19/2007
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 01/15/2008
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 01/16/2008
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/06/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 02/14/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 04/09/2008
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 06/10/2008
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 07/09/2008
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 07/14/2008
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 07/14/2008
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/14/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 10/03/2008

Show cosponsors who withdrew