Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 03/27/2007
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 03/28/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/28/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/28/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 03/28/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/28/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/28/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/28/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 03/28/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/29/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 03/29/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/29/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/29/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/29/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/29/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/29/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/29/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/29/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/16/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 04/16/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/23/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 04/23/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 04/23/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/25/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/02/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/07/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/22/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/22/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/22/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/22/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/22/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/22/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/22/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/22/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 05/22/2007
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 05/22/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/22/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/24/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/24/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/07/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/20/2007
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/28/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 06/28/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/28/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 06/28/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/28/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/28/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/28/2007