Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 03/29/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/16/2007
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 04/16/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 04/16/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/17/2007
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 04/18/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/24/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 04/25/2007
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 05/15/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/05/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 06/05/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/13/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/13/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 06/13/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/14/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 06/14/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/15/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 06/15/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/15/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/15/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 06/18/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/18/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/19/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/19/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/19/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 06/26/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 07/11/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 07/16/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/17/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/24/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/24/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 07/24/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/24/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 09/04/2007
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 09/26/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/09/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 11/13/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/13/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 11/13/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 11/13/2007
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/21/2008