Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 04/17/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 04/17/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 04/17/2007
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3]* 04/17/2007
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 04/17/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 04/17/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/18/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/18/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/23/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 05/16/2007
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/20/2007