Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 04/25/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/07/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/07/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/07/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/07/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/07/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/07/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/07/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/07/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/09/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/09/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/09/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/09/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/09/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/09/2007
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 05/09/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/09/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/09/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/09/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/09/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/09/2007
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 05/09/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/09/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/09/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/09/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/09/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/09/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 05/09/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/09/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/09/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 05/09/2007
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-45] 05/10/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 05/10/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/10/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/10/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 05/16/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 05/16/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/16/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/16/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/16/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 05/16/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/16/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/16/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/16/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/16/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/16/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/16/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/16/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/16/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/17/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/17/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/23/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/23/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/23/2007