Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 04/25/2007
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 05/03/2007
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 05/03/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 05/03/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 05/03/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 05/03/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 05/03/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/03/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/03/2007
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 05/03/2007
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 05/03/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/03/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 05/03/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 05/03/2007
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 05/03/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 05/03/2007
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 05/03/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 05/03/2007
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 05/03/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 05/03/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/03/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/03/2007
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 05/03/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/03/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/03/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 05/03/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 05/03/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/03/2007
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 05/03/2007
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/03/2007
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 05/03/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 05/03/2007
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 05/03/2007
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 05/03/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 05/03/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 05/03/2007
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 05/03/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/03/2007
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 05/03/2007
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/03/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 05/03/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/03/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/08/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 05/08/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/08/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 05/08/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/14/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 05/14/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/14/2007
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 05/14/2007
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 05/14/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 05/14/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 05/14/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 05/17/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/17/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/21/2007
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/24/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/24/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 05/24/2007
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 05/24/2007
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 05/24/2007
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 05/24/2007
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 06/05/2007
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 06/05/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 06/05/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 06/05/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/07/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 06/07/2007
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 06/14/2007
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 06/26/2007