Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 04/30/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/21/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/21/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/21/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/21/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/21/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/21/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/27/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/27/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/27/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 08/01/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 08/01/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 08/01/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 08/01/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 08/01/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 08/01/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 08/01/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 08/01/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 08/01/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 08/01/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 08/01/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 08/01/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 08/04/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 08/04/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 08/04/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 08/04/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 08/04/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 08/04/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 08/04/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 08/04/2007
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 08/04/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 08/04/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 09/18/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/18/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/18/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/18/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/18/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/17/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 04/22/2008
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/22/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/22/2008
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/22/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/22/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/23/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/24/2008
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/24/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/24/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/29/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 05/13/2008
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 05/14/2008
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 05/15/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/15/2008
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/15/2008
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/15/2008
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 05/15/2008
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/15/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 05/15/2008
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/15/2008
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/15/2008
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/15/2008
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 05/15/2008
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 05/15/2008
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 05/15/2008
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 05/15/2008
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 05/15/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/15/2008
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/15/2008
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/15/2008
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/15/2008
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 05/15/2008
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/15/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/15/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/15/2008
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/15/2008
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 05/15/2008
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/15/2008
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/15/2008
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/15/2008
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/15/2008
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 05/15/2008
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/15/2008
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/15/2008
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 05/15/2008
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/15/2008
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/15/2008
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/15/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/15/2008
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/15/2008
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/15/2008