There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing the sense of Congress relating to a free trade agreement between the United States and Taiwan.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/01/2007Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
05/15/2007Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
05/01/2007Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/01/2007Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (42)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/08/2007
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 05/10/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/14/2007
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 05/16/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/16/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/16/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/21/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/05/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 06/07/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/07/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/14/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/14/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 06/14/2007
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 06/18/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 06/25/2007
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/25/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 06/27/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 07/18/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 07/23/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 09/05/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 09/05/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/25/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 10/01/2007
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 12/04/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 12/12/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 12/19/2007
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 02/06/2008
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 02/07/2008
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 03/06/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/03/2008
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/20/2008
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 06/20/2008
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 07/09/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/22/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 07/22/2008
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 07/29/2008
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/29/2008
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 07/31/2008

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means05/01/2007 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Trade05/15/2007 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Con.Res.137. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/01/2007)

Expresses the sense of Congress that the United States should increase trade opportunities with Taiwan by launching negotiations to enter into a free trade agreement with Taiwan.