Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/08/2007
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 05/10/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/14/2007
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 05/16/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/16/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/16/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/21/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/05/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 06/07/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/07/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/14/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/14/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 06/14/2007
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 06/18/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 06/25/2007
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/25/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 06/27/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 07/18/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 07/23/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 09/05/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 09/05/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/25/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 10/01/2007
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 12/04/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 12/12/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 12/19/2007
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 02/06/2008
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 02/07/2008
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 03/06/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/03/2008
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/20/2008
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 06/20/2008
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 07/09/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/22/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 07/22/2008
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 07/29/2008
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/29/2008
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 07/31/2008