Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/02/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 05/07/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/14/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/14/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/14/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/16/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/16/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/05/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/05/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/05/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 06/05/2007
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 06/05/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/05/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 06/05/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/05/2007
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 06/05/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/06/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/11/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/11/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/11/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/11/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 06/11/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/11/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/11/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/11/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/11/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/11/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/11/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/11/2007
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 06/11/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/15/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/15/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/15/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/15/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/15/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/15/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/15/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/15/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/20/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/20/2007
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 06/20/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/20/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/20/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 07/11/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/11/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/11/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 07/11/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/17/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 07/17/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 07/17/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/17/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/18/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/18/2007
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 07/19/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 07/19/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 07/30/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/30/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 08/03/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/28/2008