Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 05/01/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/14/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/14/2007
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 05/14/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/14/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/14/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/14/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/14/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 05/22/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/22/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/22/2007
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 05/22/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 05/22/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/22/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 06/07/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 06/07/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/25/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/25/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 06/25/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/28/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/12/2007