Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 05/03/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/07/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/07/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 05/07/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/07/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/07/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/07/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/08/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/08/2007
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 05/08/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/08/2007
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 05/09/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/09/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/10/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/15/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/21/2007
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 05/22/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/22/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/22/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/22/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 05/23/2007
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 05/23/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 05/23/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 05/23/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/23/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/23/2007
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 05/23/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/23/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 05/23/2007
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 05/23/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/23/2007
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 05/23/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/23/2007
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 05/23/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 05/23/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 05/23/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 05/23/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/23/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/23/2007
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 05/23/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/23/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/23/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 05/23/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/23/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/23/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 05/24/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/24/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 06/06/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/06/2007