There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Recognizing the significance of National Caribbean-American Heritage Month.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
06/18/2007Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6593)
05/14/2007Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date Chamber
06/19/2007SenateReceived in the Senate and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
06/18/2007-3:26pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/18/2007-3:26pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6593)
06/18/2007-3:21pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Con. Res. 148.
06/18/2007-3:21pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6593-6594)
06/18/2007-3:21pmHouseMr. Davis (IL) moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution.
06/12/2007HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
06/12/2007HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
05/14/2007HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
05/14/2007HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (53)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 05/14/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/21/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/21/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/21/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/21/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/21/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/21/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 05/22/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/24/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/24/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/24/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/24/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/24/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/24/2007
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 05/24/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/24/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/05/2007
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 06/05/2007

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform05/14/2007 Referred to
06/12/2007 Markup by
Senate Judiciary06/19/2007 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Con.Res.148. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (06/18/2007)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Supports the goals and ideals of Caribbean-American Heritage Month (in the month of June).

Affirms that: (1) the contributions of Caribbean-Americans are a significant part of the history, progress, and heritage of the United States; and (2) the ethnic and racial diversity of the United States enriches and strengthens the nation.