Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 05/14/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/14/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/21/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/21/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/21/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/21/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/21/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/21/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 05/22/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/24/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/24/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/24/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/24/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/24/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/24/2007
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 05/24/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/24/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/05/2007
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 06/05/2007