Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 05/24/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/06/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 06/06/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/06/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/06/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/06/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/06/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/06/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 06/06/2007
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 06/06/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/06/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 06/06/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 06/06/2007
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 06/06/2007
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 06/06/2007
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 06/06/2007
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16] 06/06/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 06/06/2007
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 06/06/2007
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 06/06/2007
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 06/06/2007
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 06/06/2007
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 06/06/2007
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 06/06/2007
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 06/06/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/06/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/06/2007
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 06/06/2007
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 06/06/2007
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/07/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 06/07/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/11/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 06/13/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/15/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 06/15/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/18/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/18/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/18/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 06/19/2007
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 06/19/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/19/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/19/2007
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 06/19/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/20/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/20/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/21/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 06/25/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/26/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/27/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/28/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/28/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 06/28/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/28/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 07/10/2007
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 07/10/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 07/18/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/30/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 08/01/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 10/29/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 11/05/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 11/05/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 11/05/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 11/05/2007
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 11/06/2007
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 11/06/2007