Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/06/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/06/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/06/2007
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 06/06/2007
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 06/14/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 06/22/2007
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 06/25/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/27/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/10/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 07/10/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/18/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/30/2007
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 09/06/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/10/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 10/02/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/10/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 10/15/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 10/24/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 10/29/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/29/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 11/06/2007
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 11/06/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 11/07/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 11/14/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 12/04/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 12/04/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 12/04/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 12/04/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 12/12/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 12/12/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 12/13/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 01/15/2008
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 01/15/2008
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 01/15/2008
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 01/15/2008
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 01/15/2008
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 01/15/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/17/2008
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 01/23/2008
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 01/23/2008
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 02/06/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/06/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/06/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/06/2008
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 02/06/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/06/2008
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 02/06/2008
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 02/06/2008
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 02/14/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/14/2008
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 02/14/2008
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 02/14/2008
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/14/2008
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 02/14/2008
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/14/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 02/14/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/14/2008
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 02/14/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 02/27/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 02/27/2008
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 02/27/2008
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/05/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/05/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/05/2008
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 03/05/2008
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/05/2008
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 03/05/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/10/2008
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/10/2008
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 03/10/2008
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/10/2008
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/10/2008
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 03/11/2008
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 03/11/2008
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 03/11/2008
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 03/11/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/11/2008
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/11/2008
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/31/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/04/2008
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 04/04/2008
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/10/2008
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 04/10/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/16/2008
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/23/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/06/2008
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 05/06/2008
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/20/2008
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 05/21/2008
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 06/03/2008
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/05/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/05/2008
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 06/05/2008
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 06/05/2008
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/12/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/12/2008
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/17/2008
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 06/17/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 06/19/2008
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 06/19/2008