There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Supporting the goals and ideals of National Teen Driver Safety Week.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
09/05/2007Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H10100-10101)
06/06/2007Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date Chamber
09/06/2007SenateReceived in the Senate and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
09/05/2007-12:49pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/05/2007-12:49pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H10100-10101)
09/05/2007-12:38pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Con. Res. 165.
09/05/2007-12:38pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10100-10102)
09/05/2007-12:37pmHouseMr. Welch (VT) moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution.
07/19/2007HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
07/19/2007HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
06/06/2007HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
06/06/2007HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1213)
06/06/2007HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (56)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-45]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 06/06/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 06/06/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 06/06/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 06/06/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22]* 06/06/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 06/06/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 06/06/2007
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 09/04/2007

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform06/06/2007 Referred to
07/19/2007 Markup by
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation09/06/2007 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Con.Res.165. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (09/05/2007)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Supports the goals and ideals of National Teen Driver Safety Week.

Encourages the people of the United States to observe the week with activities that promote licensed teenage drivers to drive safely.