There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing the sense of the Congress that a commemorative postage stamp should be issued to honor our Nation's disabled veterans.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/27/2007Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
06/27/2007Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/27/2007Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (108)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 06/27/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 06/27/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 06/27/2007
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 06/27/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 06/28/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/11/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 07/11/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/11/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 07/12/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/12/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 07/16/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 07/16/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/18/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/18/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 07/18/2007
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 07/19/2007
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 07/23/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/23/2007
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 07/23/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 07/25/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 08/03/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 08/03/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 08/03/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 08/04/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/05/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 09/05/2007
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/05/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/07/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 09/10/2007
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 09/18/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 09/18/2007
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 09/19/2007
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/20/2007
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 09/25/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/25/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 10/04/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/16/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 10/31/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 12/05/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 12/19/2007

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform06/27/2007 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Con.Res.176.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Con.Res.176. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/27/2007)

Expresses the sense of Congress that a commemorative postage stamp be issued by the United States Postal Service to honor our nation's disabled veterans.