Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/10/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/10/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/10/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/10/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/10/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/12/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 07/24/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/24/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/30/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 07/30/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/30/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/30/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 08/01/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 08/01/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 08/02/2007