Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 09/07/2007
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 09/07/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 09/07/2007
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/07/2007
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 09/07/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/07/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/27/2007
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 09/27/2007
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 09/27/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/27/2007
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 10/04/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 10/04/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/04/2007
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 10/10/2007
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 10/10/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 10/10/2007
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 10/10/2007
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 10/10/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 10/10/2007
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 10/10/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 10/10/2007
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 10/10/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 10/15/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 10/15/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 10/15/2007
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 10/15/2007
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 10/15/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 10/15/2007
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 10/15/2007
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 10/15/2007
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 10/15/2007
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 10/15/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 10/15/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 10/15/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 10/15/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 10/15/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 10/15/2007
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 10/15/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/15/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 10/15/2007
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 10/15/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 10/15/2007