Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 07/13/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 07/13/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 07/13/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 07/13/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 07/13/2007
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 07/13/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 07/13/2007
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 07/31/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 07/31/2007
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 07/31/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/31/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 07/31/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 07/31/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 07/31/2007
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 07/31/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 07/31/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/31/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/31/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/31/2007
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 07/31/2007
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 07/31/2007
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 08/03/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 08/03/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 08/03/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 08/03/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 08/03/2007
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 08/03/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 08/03/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 08/03/2007
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 08/03/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 09/20/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 09/20/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 09/20/2007
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 09/20/2007
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 09/20/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/20/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 09/20/2007
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/24/2007