Text: H.Con.Res.188 — 110th Congress (2007-2008)All Bill Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Referred in Senate (08/03/2007)


110th CONGRESS
1st Session
H. CON. RES. 188

IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES
July 31, 2007

Received

August 3, 2007

Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs


CONCURRENT RESOLUTION

Condemning the attack on the AMIA Jewish Community Center in Buenos Aires, Argentina, in July 1994, and for other purposes.

Whereas on July 18, 1994, 85 innocent people were killed and 300 were wounded when the Argentine Jewish Mutual Association (AMIA) was bombed in Buenos Aires, Argentina;

Whereas extensive evidence links the planning of the attacks to the Government of Iran, and the execution of the attacks to the terrorist group Hezbollah, which is based in Lebanon, supported by Syria, and sponsored by Iran;

Whereas on October 25, 2006, the State Prosecutor of Argentina, an office created by the current Government of Argentina, concluded that the AMIA bombing was “decided and organized by the highest leaders of the former government of … Iran, whom, at the same time, entrusted its execution to the Lebanese terrorist group Hezbollah”;

Whereas on October 25, 2006, the State Prosecutor of Argentina concluded that the AMIA bombing had been approved in advance by Iran’s Supreme Leader Ali Khamene’i, Iran’s then-leader Ali Akbar Hashemi Rafsanjani, Iran’s then-Foreign Minister Ali Akbar Velayati, and Iran’s then-Minister of Security and Intelligence Ali Fallahijan;

Whereas on October 25, 2006, the State Prosecutor of Argentina stated that the Government of Iran uses “terrorism as a mechanism of its foreign policy” in support of “its final aim [which] is to export its radicalized vision of Islam and to eliminate the enemies of the regime”;

Whereas on October 25, 2006, the State Prosecutor of Argentina identified Ibrahim Hussein Berro, a Lebanese citizen and member of Hezbollah, as the suicide bomber who primarily carried out the attack on the AMIA;

Whereas on November 9, 2006, Argentine Judge Rodolfo Canicoba Corral, pursuant to the request of the State Prosecutor of Argentina, issued an arrest warrant for Ali Akbar Hashemi Rafsanjani, a former leader of Iran and the current chairman of Iran's Expediency Council, for his involvement in the AMIA bombing and urged the International Criminal Police Organization (INTERPOL) to issue a capture notice (commonly known as a “red notice”) for Rafsanjani;

Whereas on November 9, 2006, Argentine Judge Rodolfo Canicoba Corral, pursuant to the request of the State Prosecutor of Argentina, also issued arrest warrants for Ali Fallahijan, a former Iranian Minister of Security and Intelligence, Ali Akbar Velayati, a former Iranian Foreign Minister, Mohsen Rezai, a former commander of Iran’s Islamic Revolutionary Guards Corps (IRGC), Ahmad Vahidi, a former commander of the elite Al-Quds Force of the IRGC, Hadi Soleimanpour, a former Iranian ambassador to Argentina, Mohsen Rabbani, a former cultural attache at the Iranian Embassy in Buenos Aires, Ahmed Reza Asghari, a former official at the Iranian Embassy in Buenos Aires, and Imad Moughnieh, a leading operations chief of Hezbollah;

Whereas on March 5, 2007, the Executive Committee of INTERPOL supported the issuance of red notices for Hezbollah operative Imad Moughnieh and five Iranian officials noted above for whom Argentine Judge Rodolfo Canicoba Corral issued arrest warrants;

Whereas Iran has appealed the INTERPOL Executive Committee's decision, and the General Assembly of INTERPOL will issue a final ruling on the red notices when it meets in Morocco in November 2007;

Whereas the inability to reach suspected Islamist militants and Iranian officials has debilitated the efforts of the Government of Argentina to prosecute masterminds and planners of the 1994 AMIA bombing;

Whereas the current Government of Argentina has made significant advances in the AMIA investigation; and

Whereas Argentina recently approved anti-terrorist legislation which seeks to criminalize financing, fund-raising, and money laundering activities of groups linked to terrorism: Now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the House of Representatives (the Senate concurring), That Congress—

(1) reiterates its strongest condemnation of the 1994 attack on the AMIA Jewish Community Center in Buenos Aires, Argentina, and honors the victims of this heinous act;

(2) expresses its sympathy to the relatives of the victims, who have waited 13 years without justice for the loss of their loved ones, and may have to wait even longer for justice to be served;

(3) applauds the current Government of Argentina for increasing the pace of the AMIA bombing investigation, as well as on its recently approved anti-terrorism legislation;

(4) urges the Government of Argentina to continue to dedicate and provide the resources necessary for its judicial system and intelligence agencies to investigate all areas of the AMIA case and to bring those responsible to justice;

(5) calls upon the General Assembly of INTERPOL to uphold, issue and implement the red notices supported by the Executive Committee of INTERPOL in March 2007; and

(6) calls upon responsible nations to cooperate fully with the investigation, including by making information, witnesses, and suspects available for review and questioning by the appropriate Argentine authorities, and by detaining and extraditing to Argentina, if given the opportunity, any of the Iranian officials and former officials, Hezbollah operatives, and Islamist militants against whom Argentine or international arrest warrants are pending in connection with the AMIA case.

Passed the House of Representatives July 30, 2007.

Attest: lorraine c. miller,   
Clerk.