Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 07/30/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/30/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/30/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 07/30/2007
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 07/30/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 07/31/2007
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 07/31/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/31/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 07/31/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 07/31/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 07/31/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/31/2007
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 08/01/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 08/01/2007
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 08/01/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 08/01/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 08/01/2007
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 08/01/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 08/01/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 08/02/2007
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 08/02/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 08/02/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 08/02/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 08/02/2007
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 08/02/2007
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 08/02/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 08/02/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 08/02/2007
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 08/02/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 08/02/2007
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 08/02/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 08/03/2007
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 08/03/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 08/03/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 08/03/2007
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 08/03/2007
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 08/03/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 08/03/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 08/03/2007
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 08/03/2007
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 08/03/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 08/03/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 08/03/2007
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 08/03/2007
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 08/03/2007
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 08/03/2007
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 08/03/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 08/03/2007
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 08/03/2007
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 08/03/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 08/03/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 08/03/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 08/03/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 08/03/2007
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 08/03/2007
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16] 08/03/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 08/03/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 08/04/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 08/04/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 08/04/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 08/04/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 08/04/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 08/04/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 08/04/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 08/04/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 08/04/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 08/04/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 08/04/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 08/04/2007
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 09/04/2007
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 09/04/2007
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 09/04/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 09/04/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 09/04/2007
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 09/04/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/04/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 09/05/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/14/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/17/2007
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 09/18/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 09/18/2007