Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 11/14/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 02/26/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/05/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/05/2008
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 03/31/2008
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 04/15/2008
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/15/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/15/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/15/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/15/2008
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 04/15/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/15/2008
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 04/23/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/06/2008
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/15/2008
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/15/2008
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/15/2008
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/15/2008
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 05/15/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/15/2008
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/15/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/15/2008
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 05/15/2008
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 05/20/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/20/2008
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/20/2008
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 05/20/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 05/20/2008
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 06/03/2008
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 06/03/2008
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 06/03/2008
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/03/2008
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/03/2008
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 06/03/2008
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 06/03/2008
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 06/03/2008
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 06/03/2008
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/03/2008
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/03/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/03/2008
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 06/03/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/03/2008
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/03/2008
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 06/03/2008
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 06/03/2008
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/03/2008
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 06/03/2008
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 06/03/2008
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 06/03/2008
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 06/03/2008
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 06/03/2008
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/03/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 06/03/2008
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/23/2008