Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 08/01/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 08/01/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 08/01/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 08/01/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 08/01/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 08/01/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 08/01/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 08/01/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 08/01/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 08/01/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 08/01/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 08/01/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 08/01/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/24/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/24/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/24/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/24/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/24/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 09/24/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/24/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 09/24/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/24/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/24/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/24/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/25/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/27/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 09/27/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 10/01/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/10/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/10/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/16/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 10/16/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 10/16/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 10/16/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 10/16/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 10/16/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 10/24/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 10/24/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/30/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 12/05/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 12/05/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 12/05/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 12/05/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 12/05/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 12/05/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 12/05/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 12/05/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 12/05/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 12/05/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 12/05/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 12/06/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 12/11/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 12/11/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 12/17/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 12/17/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 12/17/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 12/17/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 12/17/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 12/17/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 12/17/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 12/17/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 12/17/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 12/17/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 12/17/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 01/15/2008
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 01/15/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 01/15/2008
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 01/15/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 01/15/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 01/15/2008
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 01/15/2008
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 01/15/2008
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 01/15/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 01/15/2008
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 01/16/2008
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 01/16/2008
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 01/16/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 01/17/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/17/2008
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 01/18/2008
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 01/22/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 01/22/2008
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 01/22/2008