Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 01/05/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 12/11/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 12/11/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 12/11/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 12/12/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 12/12/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 12/17/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 01/16/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/24/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/24/2008
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 05/07/2008
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 05/07/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/08/2008
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/08/2008
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/08/2008
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 05/08/2008
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 05/08/2008
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/08/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/08/2008
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/08/2008
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/08/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/08/2008
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/08/2008
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/08/2008
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 05/08/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/08/2008
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/08/2008
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/08/2008
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/08/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/08/2008
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 05/08/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/08/2008
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/08/2008
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/08/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/08/2008
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/08/2008
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/08/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/08/2008
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/08/2008
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/08/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/08/2008
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/08/2008
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/08/2008
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/08/2008
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/08/2008
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/08/2008