Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 09/05/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 09/10/2007
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 09/10/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/10/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/10/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/10/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/10/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/10/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/10/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 09/10/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/10/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/10/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/10/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/10/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/10/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 09/10/2007
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 09/17/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 09/17/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/17/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/17/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/17/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 09/17/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 09/17/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/17/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/17/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/17/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/19/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/19/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 09/19/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/19/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 09/25/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/25/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/25/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/26/2007