Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 09/14/2007
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/18/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 09/24/2007
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 09/24/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/24/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 09/24/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/26/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 09/26/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 10/01/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 10/04/2007
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 10/10/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 10/12/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 10/29/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 11/15/2007