Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 09/07/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/07/2007
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 09/07/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 09/17/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/17/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 09/17/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 09/19/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/19/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 09/19/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/19/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 09/19/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 09/19/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/19/2007
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 09/19/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 09/19/2007
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 09/19/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 09/19/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/19/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/19/2007
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 09/19/2007
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 09/19/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 09/19/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 09/19/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 09/19/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/19/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/19/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 09/19/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/19/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 09/19/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/19/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/19/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/19/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 09/19/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/19/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/19/2007
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 09/19/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/19/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/19/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 09/19/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/19/2007
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 09/19/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/19/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/19/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/19/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/19/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/19/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/19/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/19/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 09/19/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 09/19/2007
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 09/19/2007
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 10/02/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/16/2007