Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/30/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 10/30/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 10/30/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 10/30/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 10/30/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 10/30/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/30/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/30/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 10/30/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/30/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 10/30/2007
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 10/30/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 10/30/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/30/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/30/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 10/30/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 10/30/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/30/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 10/30/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 10/30/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 10/30/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/30/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 10/30/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 10/30/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 10/30/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/30/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 10/30/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 10/30/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 10/30/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 10/30/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/30/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 10/30/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/30/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/30/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/30/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/30/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 10/30/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/30/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/30/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 10/30/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 10/30/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 10/30/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 10/30/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 10/30/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 10/30/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 11/01/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 11/01/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 11/01/2007
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 11/01/2007
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 11/05/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 11/09/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 11/09/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 11/09/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 11/09/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 11/13/2007
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 11/13/2007
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 11/13/2007