Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 09/18/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 09/18/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 09/18/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/29/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/30/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 10/30/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 10/30/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/30/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 10/30/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 11/06/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/06/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 11/06/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/06/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 11/13/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 11/13/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 11/13/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 11/15/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 11/15/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/15/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 12/18/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/20/2008
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/20/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/25/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/25/2008
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/25/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/25/2008
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/25/2008
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/25/2008
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 06/25/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/26/2008
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/26/2008
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 06/26/2008
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/26/2008
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/26/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/10/2008
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/10/2008
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/10/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/14/2008
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/14/2008
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 07/16/2008