Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 10/04/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 10/04/2007
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 10/04/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 10/04/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 10/04/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 10/04/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 10/04/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 10/04/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 10/04/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 10/04/2007
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 10/04/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 10/04/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 10/04/2007
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 10/04/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 10/04/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 10/04/2007
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 10/12/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/12/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 10/12/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/12/2007
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 10/12/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 10/23/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 10/23/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 10/23/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 10/23/2007
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 10/23/2007
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 10/23/2007
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 10/23/2007
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 10/23/2007
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 10/23/2007
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 10/23/2007
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 10/23/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 10/23/2007
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 10/23/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 10/23/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 10/23/2007
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 10/23/2007
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 10/23/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 10/23/2007
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 10/23/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 10/23/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 10/25/2007
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 10/25/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 10/25/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 10/25/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 10/25/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 10/25/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 10/25/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 10/25/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 10/25/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 10/25/2007
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 10/25/2007
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 10/25/2007
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 10/25/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 10/25/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 10/25/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 10/25/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 10/25/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 10/25/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 10/25/2007
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 10/25/2007
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 10/25/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 10/25/2007
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 10/25/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 10/25/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 10/25/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/25/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 10/25/2007
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 10/25/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 10/25/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 10/25/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 10/25/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 10/25/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 10/25/2007
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 10/25/2007
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 10/25/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 10/25/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 11/01/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 11/01/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 11/01/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 11/05/2007