Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 09/27/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/27/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 09/27/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/27/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 09/27/2007
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 09/27/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 09/27/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 09/27/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 09/27/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 09/27/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 09/27/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 09/27/2007
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 09/27/2007
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 09/27/2007
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 09/27/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/27/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/27/2007
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 09/27/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 09/27/2007
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 09/27/2007
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 09/27/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 10/02/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 10/02/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/02/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 10/02/2007
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 10/02/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 10/09/2007
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 10/09/2007
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 10/09/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 10/10/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 10/10/2007
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 10/10/2007
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 10/10/2007
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 10/10/2007
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 10/10/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 10/18/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 10/18/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 10/18/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 10/18/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 11/05/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 01/28/2008