Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 01/30/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/17/2007
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 10/04/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/14/2008
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/10/2008