Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 10/02/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 10/09/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/18/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/24/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 11/06/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 11/07/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 11/07/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 12/04/2007
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 12/04/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 12/05/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 12/06/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 12/11/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 12/13/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 01/22/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 02/13/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/13/2008
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 03/04/2008
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/04/2008
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 03/13/2008
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 03/31/2008
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/31/2008
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/15/2008
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 05/06/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 05/07/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/07/2008
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 05/13/2008
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/19/2008
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 05/19/2008
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 06/04/2008
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/12/2008
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 06/25/2008
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/25/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/25/2008
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/08/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/08/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 07/08/2008
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/10/2008
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 07/14/2008
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 07/15/2008
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 07/22/2008
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 07/22/2008
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/22/2008
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 07/22/2008
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 07/22/2008
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 07/29/2008
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 07/29/2008
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 07/31/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/08/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/08/2008
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 09/08/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/23/2008