Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 10/02/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 10/04/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 10/04/2007
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 10/09/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/16/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 10/16/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 10/16/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 10/16/2007
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 10/17/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/17/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 10/17/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/24/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 10/31/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 11/05/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 12/04/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 12/06/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/06/2008