Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 01/10/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 01/11/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 01/11/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 01/11/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 01/11/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 01/11/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 01/12/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/16/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 01/16/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 01/16/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 01/22/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 01/22/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 01/22/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/13/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 02/13/2007