Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 10/10/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 10/15/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/15/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 10/15/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 10/15/2007
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 10/15/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 10/15/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 10/15/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 10/16/2007
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 10/16/2007
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 10/16/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 10/16/2007
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 10/16/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/16/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 10/16/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 10/16/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/16/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 10/16/2007
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 10/16/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 10/17/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 10/17/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/17/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/17/2007
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 10/18/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 10/18/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 10/18/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/22/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 10/22/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 10/22/2007
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 10/22/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 10/22/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 10/22/2007
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 10/22/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 10/22/2007
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 10/22/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 10/22/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 10/22/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 10/22/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/22/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 10/22/2007
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 10/22/2007
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 10/22/2007
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 10/22/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 10/22/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 10/22/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/22/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 10/22/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/22/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 10/22/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 10/22/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/22/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 10/22/2007
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 10/22/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 10/22/2007
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 10/22/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 10/22/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/22/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 10/22/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 10/22/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/22/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 10/22/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/22/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 10/22/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 10/22/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 10/23/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 10/23/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 10/23/2007
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 10/23/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 10/24/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 10/29/2007