Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 10/15/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 10/16/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 10/16/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 10/16/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/16/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 10/16/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 10/17/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/17/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 10/17/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 10/17/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 10/18/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/18/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/18/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 10/18/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 10/18/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/22/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 10/22/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 10/22/2007
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 10/22/2007
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 10/22/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 10/22/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/22/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/22/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 10/22/2007
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 10/22/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 10/22/2007
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 10/22/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 10/22/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 10/22/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 10/23/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 10/23/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 10/23/2007
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 10/23/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 10/23/2007