There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

Recognizing and acknowledging the important role of adoption, and commending all parties involved, including birthparents who carry out an adoption plan, adoptive families, and adopted children.

Official Title as Introduced

Recognizing and honoring birthparents who carry out an adoption plan.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
09/26/2008Passed/agreed to in House: On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection.
09/26/2008Committee on Education and Labor discharged.
10/18/2007Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber
10/02/2008SenateReferred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
09/27/2008SenateReceived in the Senate.
09/26/2008-8:33pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
09/26/2008-8:33pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/26/2008-8:33pmHouseOn agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection.
09/26/2008-8:33pmHouseH.Amdt.1192 On agreeing to the Andrews amendment (A002) Agreed to without objection.
09/26/2008-8:33pmHouseH.Amdt.1192 Amendment (A002) offered by Mr. Andrews.
09/26/2008-8:33pmHouseH.Amdt.1180 On agreeing to the Andrews amendment (A001) Agreed to without objection.
09/26/2008-8:33pmHouseH.Amdt.1180 Amendment (A001) offered by Mr. Andrews. (consideration: CR H10118; text: CR H10118)
09/26/2008-8:33pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H10118; text of measure as introduced: CR H10118)
09/26/2008HouseCommittee on Education and Labor discharged.
09/26/2008-8:33pmHouseMr. Andrews asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
10/18/2007HouseReferred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
10/18/2007HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (46)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 10/18/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 10/18/2007
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 10/25/2007
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 10/29/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 10/30/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 10/30/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/30/2007
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 10/31/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 11/01/2007
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 11/01/2007
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 11/07/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 11/07/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 11/08/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 11/09/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 11/13/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 11/13/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 11/13/2007
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 11/13/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 11/13/2007
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 11/14/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 11/14/2007
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 11/14/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 11/14/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 11/14/2007
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 11/14/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 11/14/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 11/14/2007
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 11/15/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 11/15/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 11/15/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 11/15/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 12/04/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 12/04/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 12/04/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 12/04/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 12/04/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 12/04/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 12/11/2007
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 12/11/2007
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 12/13/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 12/13/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 12/19/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 02/19/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/04/2008
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/03/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 07/10/2008

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and Labor10/18/2007 Referred to
09/26/2008 Discharged from
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions10/02/2008 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Con.Res.239.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Con.Res.239. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (09/26/2008)

Recognizes and acknowledges the important role of adoption, and commends all parties involved, including birthparents who carry out an adoption plan, adoptive families, and adopted children.