Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 10/18/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 10/18/2007
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 10/25/2007
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 10/29/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 10/30/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 10/30/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/30/2007
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 10/31/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 11/01/2007
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 11/01/2007
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 11/07/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 11/07/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 11/08/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 11/09/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 11/13/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 11/13/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 11/13/2007
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 11/13/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 11/13/2007
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 11/14/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 11/14/2007
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 11/14/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 11/14/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 11/14/2007
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 11/14/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 11/14/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 11/14/2007
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 11/15/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 11/15/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 11/15/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 11/15/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 12/04/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 12/04/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 12/04/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 12/04/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 12/04/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 12/04/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 12/11/2007
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 12/11/2007
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 12/13/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 12/13/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 12/19/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 02/19/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/04/2008
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/03/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 07/10/2008