Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 11/07/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 11/07/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 11/07/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 11/07/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 11/07/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 11/07/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 11/07/2007
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 11/07/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 11/07/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 11/07/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 11/07/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 11/07/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 11/07/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 11/07/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 11/07/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 11/07/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 11/07/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 11/07/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 11/07/2007
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 11/07/2007
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 11/07/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 11/07/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/07/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 11/08/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 11/08/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 11/08/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 11/08/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 11/08/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 11/08/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 11/08/2007
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 11/08/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 11/08/2007
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 11/08/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 11/08/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 11/08/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 11/08/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 11/08/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/08/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 11/08/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 11/08/2007
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 11/08/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 11/08/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 11/13/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 11/13/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 11/13/2007
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 11/13/2007
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 11/13/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 11/13/2007
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 11/13/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 11/13/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 11/13/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 11/13/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 11/13/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 11/13/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 11/13/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 11/13/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 11/13/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 11/13/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 11/13/2007
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 11/13/2007
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 11/13/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 11/13/2007
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 11/13/2007
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 11/13/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 11/13/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 11/13/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 11/13/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 12/04/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 12/04/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 12/04/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 12/04/2007
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 12/04/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 12/17/2007
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 12/17/2007