Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 11/09/2007
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 11/09/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 11/09/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 11/09/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 11/09/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 11/09/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 11/09/2007
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 11/09/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/09/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 11/09/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 12/04/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 12/04/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 12/04/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 12/04/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 12/04/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 12/04/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 12/10/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 12/10/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 12/10/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 12/10/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 12/13/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 12/13/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 12/19/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 12/19/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 12/19/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 01/23/2008
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 01/23/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/07/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/07/2008
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 02/14/2008
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/02/2008
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/02/2008
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 04/17/2008