Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 01/10/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 01/10/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 01/10/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 01/12/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 01/12/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 01/12/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 01/12/2007
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 01/12/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 01/12/2007
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 01/19/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 01/19/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 01/19/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 01/19/2007
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 01/19/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 01/19/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 01/24/2007
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 01/24/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 01/24/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 01/24/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 01/24/2007
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 01/31/2007
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 01/31/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 01/31/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/31/2007
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 02/16/2007
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 02/16/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/09/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 03/09/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 03/23/2007
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 03/23/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/23/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/29/2007
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 03/29/2007
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 03/29/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/20/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/20/2007
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 04/20/2007
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 04/20/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/26/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 04/26/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/02/2007
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 05/17/2007
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 05/17/2007
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 06/15/2007
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 06/15/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/15/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 06/22/2007
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 08/03/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 08/03/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 09/24/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 09/24/2007