Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 11/08/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 11/08/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 11/08/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 11/08/2007
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 11/08/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7]* 11/08/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 11/08/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 11/08/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 11/08/2007
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 11/08/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 11/08/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 11/08/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 11/08/2007
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 11/08/2007
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 11/08/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 11/08/2007
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 11/08/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 11/08/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 11/14/2007
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 11/14/2007
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 11/14/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 11/14/2007
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 11/14/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 11/14/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 11/14/2007
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 11/14/2007
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 11/14/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 11/14/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 11/14/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 11/14/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 11/14/2007
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 12/04/2007
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 12/04/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 12/12/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 12/12/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 12/19/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 12/19/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 12/19/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 01/15/2008
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 02/12/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 06/18/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/19/2008
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/15/2008